Kinser v. United Methodist Agency for the Retarded

Defendant: United Methodist Agency for the Retarded - Western North Carolina, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bobby J Kinser
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00175
Filed: March 19, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/10/2013. (tmg) (Main Document 14 replaced on 12/10/2013) (tmg).
January 15, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Compel, Plaintiff shall respond to the requested discovery as directed herein, on or before January 29, 2014; denying as moot 15 Motion for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines. Deadlines are revised as follows (Discovery due by 2/10/2014., Motions due by 2/28/2014., Mediation deadline set for 2/21/2014.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/14/2014. (eef)
June 20, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion for Reconsideration Of Extension Of Time To File Response To Defendant's 34 Motion To Strike. Response due 7/8/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/19/2014. (tmg)
August 15, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Strike ; granting 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/15/2014. (eef) Modified text on 8/15/2014 (eef).
August 15, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 8/15/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kinser v. United Methodist Agency for the Retarded
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Methodist Agency for the Retarded - Western North Carolina, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby J Kinser
Represented By: Todd J. Combs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]