Ann Brock v. Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan et al

Defendant: United Behavioral Health, Inc. and Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan
Plaintiff: Ann Brock
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00176
Filed: March 19, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 110 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 111 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/17/2014. (eef)
August 8, 2014 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 119 Motion to Seal Responses to Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 08/08/2014. (jlk)
September 16, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 113 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 115 Motion for Summary Judgment, the final decision of the Plan Administrator denying plaintiffs claim for benefits is REVERSED, Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 09/16/2014. (jlk)
September 16, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 09/16/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 09/16/2014. (jlk)
July 23, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/23/2013. (blf)
September 5, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Consent MOTION to Seal, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 42 MOTION to Stay and for Entry of Order of Remand,( Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr.). Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/4/2013. (blf)
September 17, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/16/2013. (blf)
March 26, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/26/2013. (blf)
September 24, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/23/2013. (blf)
November 4, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion to Stay and for Entry of Order of Remand. This matter is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/4/2013. (blf)
December 31, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Motion to Reopen Case; granting 93 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 92 motion requesting redaction. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 12/30/2013. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ann Brock v. Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Douglas Childs
Represented By: Howard Brent Helms
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company Health Plan
Represented By: Nathan Douglas Childs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Brock
Represented By: Bryan Lee Tyson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]