Boston v. Client Services of Missouri, Inc.

Plaintiff: Regina Boston
Defendant: Client Services of Missouri, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00184
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER re 16 MOTION for Recusal directing motion be assigned to the Chief Judge of the District for disposition. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/5/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
August 12, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER denying 16 Motion for Recusal.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/12/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
November 1, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/1/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
November 1, 2013 23 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/1/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Boston v. Client Services of Missouri, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Boston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Client Services of Missouri, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]