United States of America v. $63,289.00 in United States Currency

Defendant: $63,289.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2013cv00281
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Dismiss any motion to suppress. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/17/2014. (blf)
July 1, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all right, title and interest in the Defendant Property $63,289.00 in United States Currency is ORDERED forfeited to Plaintiff United States of America; Further Ordered that Plaintiff deposit Defendant Property into the appropriate assets forfeiture fund and dispose of Defendant Property according to law. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/1/2014. (eef)
July 1, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 7/1/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef)
July 23, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Amendment to 8 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan, Owing to the nature of this case, there is no longer a requirement for initial pretrial disclosures by the parties. An IAC is not necessary. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/22/2013. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $63,289.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $63,289.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Larry Economos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas R. Ascik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.