Williams v. Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education

Defendant: Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education
Plaintiff: Ellis Leon Williams
Case Number: 3:2013cv00292
Filed: May 14, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000ra Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 8 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 13 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/22/2014. (blf)
July 8, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 07/07/2014. (jlk)
September 23, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 09/23/2014. (jlk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis Leon Williams
Represented By: Geraldine Sumter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.