Scott v. North Carolina Department of Revenue

Defendant: North Carolina Department of Revenue
Plaintiff: Doris Kimberly Scott
Case Number: 3:2013cv00294
Filed: May 14, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; withdrawing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 10 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/30/2013. (blf)
March 26, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER deferring ruling on 12 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/25/2014. (eef)
May 9, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss; affirming 21 Memorandum and Recommendations. The defendant shall file Answer to remaining claim within 14 days. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/8/2014. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. North Carolina Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Kimberly Scott
Represented By: Geraldine Sumter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.