Intellectual Ventures I, LLC et al v. Bank of America et al

Defendant: Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, National Association
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC and Intellectual Ventures I LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00358
Filed: June 12, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 17 18 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Donald R. Steinberg,Nina S. Tallon,William F. Lee,Michael J. Summersgill for Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/16/2013. (blf)
August 20, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Marc Belloli for Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/20/2013. (tmg)
August 26, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/26/13. (bsw)
August 26, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Arthur Wallis Corviello for Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/26/2013. (blf)
September 6, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER administratively denying 24 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/6/2013. (blf)
October 11, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 41 42 43 44 45 46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Yakov Zolotorev,Peter Mikhail,Lawrence McDonough,Daniel Castro,Nickolas Bohl,David Alberti,Vinay Kumar Malik for Intellectual Ventures I LLC,Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 10/11/2013. (blf)
December 3, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/3/2013. (blf)
March 5, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting 50 Memorandum and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/4/2014. (blf)
March 5, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/4/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (blf)
June 13, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Sal Lim for Intellectual Ventures I LLC,Sal Lim for Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/13/2013. (blf)
June 14, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Ian Feinberg,Elizabeth Day for Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/13/2013. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Intellectual Ventures I, LLC et al v. Bank of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Stacie C. Knight
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Stacie C. Knight
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Represented By: J. Daniel Bishop
Represented By: Amy Nicole Bokor
Represented By: Elizabeth Day
Represented By: Ian Feinberg
Represented By: Sal Lim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Represented By: Amy Nicole Bokor
Represented By: J. Daniel Bishop
Represented By: Elizabeth Day
Represented By: Ian Feinberg
Represented By: Sal Lim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]