Prosperity Village Townhome Association, Inc. et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Prosperity Village Homeowners Association and Prosperity Village Townhome Association, Inc.
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00363
Filed: June 13, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Scott Hunziker for Prosperity Village Homeowners Association, Prosperity Village Townhome Association, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/6/2013. (tmg)
August 29, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/29/2014. (eef)
September 8, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER before the court on it's own motion. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/8/2014. (eef)
November 6, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Jury Verdict dated November 5, 2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Prosperity Village Townhome Association, Inc. et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prosperity Village Homeowners Association
Represented By: Justin Louis Lowenberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prosperity Village Townhome Association, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Louis Lowenberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Conor Patrick Regan
Represented By: James Scott Lewis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]