Currie v. The Phoenix Insurance Company et al

Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company, The Phoenix Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company and Travelers Property Casualty Corporation
Plaintiff: Andrew W. Currie
Case Number: 3:2013cv00366
Filed: June 13, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Union
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER administratively denying as moot without prejudice 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/14/2013. (blf)
October 22, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Corporation, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travele rs Indemnity Company, The Phoenix Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company ( Objections to M&R due by 11/8/2013), ORDER granting 25 .. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/21/2013. (blf)
November 26, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 32 Objections and 35 Reply (Oral Argument set for 1/15/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr.). Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/26/2013. (tmg)
January 29, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 30 Memorandum and Recommendations.; granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 1/29/2014. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Currie v. The Phoenix Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Reid Calwell Adams, Jr.
Represented By: James A. Dean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Reid Calwell Adams, Jr.
Represented By: James A. Dean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Reid Calwell Adams, Jr.
Represented By: James A. Dean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: James A. Dean
Represented By: Reid Calwell Adams, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: James A. Dean
Represented By: Reid Calwell Adams, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Reid Calwell Adams, Jr.
Represented By: James A. Dean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Corporation
Represented By: Reid Calwell Adams, Jr.
Represented By: James A. Dean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew W. Currie
Represented By: Carol Huffman Kendrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]