Jackson v. USA

Petitioner: Cecil Edward Jackson
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2013cv00390
Filed: June 26, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/5/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
March 5, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/5/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
March 24, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/24/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
July 3, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/2/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
July 3, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated July 3, 2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cecil Edward Jackson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]