Hagen v. USA

Petitioner: David A. Hagen
Respondent: USA
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00394
Filed: July 1, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in part without prejudice and allowed in part 7 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and Leave to Add Additional Ground for Relief; denying 8 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 9 Motion to Admit Documentary Evidence. The Government shall respond within time period set forth in 3 Order. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 9/6/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
November 7, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to add one more claim for relief under section 2255 petition. Government shall have up to and including 12/13/2013 in order to file its response to Petitioners § 2255 petition, as amended by this Order. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 11/7/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
January 16, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; granting 21 MOTION for Extension of Time Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 1/16/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
February 24, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion to Fix Additional Time to Reply to Government's response. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 2/24/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
August 8, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255); granting 22 Government's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 16 , 19 , 33 Petitioner's Motions for Summary Judgment. Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 8/8/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
August 8, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated August 8, 2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
October 1, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within 30 days, Petitioner is permitted to file an amended Rule 59(e) motion, deleting the successive § 2255 claims. If an amended motion is not timely filed, the court will treat the presently pending motion as a successive § 2255 motion. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 10/1/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
August 6, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 5 Motion for expansion of record, Clerk directed to unseal document #117-1 and 117-2 in criminal case 3:08cr93-2. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 8/6/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hagen v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David A. Hagen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]