Andritz Hydro Corp. et al v. PPL Montana, LLC

Defendant: PPL Montana, LLC and PPL Energy Supply, LLC
Plaintiff: Andritz (USA) Inc. and Andritz Hydro Corp.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00412
Filed: July 18, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/31/2013. (blf)
August 21, 2013 25 Featured Case CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/20/2013. (eef)
October 10, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER adopting 34 Memorandum and Recommendations.; denying 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 10/10/2013. (blf)
December 4, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael C. Castellon for Andritz (USA) Inc., Andritz Hydro Corp.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/4/2013. (blf)
February 13, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 51 Motion to Transfer Venue for the Consolidation of Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/13/2014. (tmg)
March 5, 2014 59 Featured Case ORDER denying 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 49 Motion to Transfer Venue for Consolidation of Cases, granting Motion to Enjoin Prosecution of Later-Filed Action. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/4/2014. (blf)
July 19, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert M. Rolfe,Brian Wright for PPL Montana, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/19/2013. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Andritz Hydro Corp. et al v. PPL Montana, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPL Montana, LLC
Represented By: Melissa A. Romanzo
Represented By: Robert Martin Rolfe
Represented By: Brian Wright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPL Energy Supply, LLC
Represented By: Melissa A. Romanzo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andritz (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Pearlynn Gilleece Houck
Represented By: Robert Walker Fuller, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andritz Hydro Corp.
Represented By: Pearlynn Gilleece Houck
Represented By: Robert Walker Fuller, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]