Johnson v. Lewis et al

Plaintiff: Zane Johnson
Defendant: Kenneth E. Lassiter, Randall J. Speer, James Rice, Robert C. Lewis, Jackie Parker and John Does
Case Number: 3:2013de00148
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Anson
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days from service of this Order in which to resubmit his Complaint and the accompanying allegations so that the Court can clearly read them.. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 12/3/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
March 12, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion ; denying 7 Motion to Substitute Party. ; denying 8 Motion for TRO; denying 9 Motion ; denying 12 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/12/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
December 16, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Plaintiff has sufficiently stated a claim against Defendant Solomon in his official capacity for purposes of receiving prospective injunctive relief in this action, but all other Defendants and claims are dismissed. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 12/16/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Lewis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zane Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth E. Lassiter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall J. Speer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Lewis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Parker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]