State of NC, ex rel v. El Paso Natural Gas, et al

Case Number: 5:2004cv00038
Filed: April 8, 2004
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
Referring Judge: Carl Horn
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2008 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion to Stay; case stayed for period of 3 months, to and including 12/15/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl Horn, III on 9/15/2008. (cbb)
March 18, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT DECREE. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 3/17/2009. (cbb)
July 13, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT DECREE AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 7/9/2009. (cbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of NC, ex rel v. El Paso Natural Gas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.