Barber v. DeRoyal Industries, Inc.

Plaintiff: Alexis Christopher Barber
Defendant: DeRoyal Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv00146
Filed: October 18, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Iredell
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Frank Alvarez,Kristin Elizabeth McLaughlin for DeRoyal Industries, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/7/2011. (cbb)
October 16, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion to Seal Exhibits B-E. Exhibits B-E to Memorandum In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment shall be sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/16/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(smj)
October 10, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ordering that Plaintiff has 14 days to respond to 22 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's responses due by 10/31/2013. Failure to respond may result in dismissal of Plaintiff's claims with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 10/10/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(smj)
November 5, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plf to respond within 14 days to dft's 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Set/Reset Deadlines as to 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Responses due by 11/25/2013). Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 11/4/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
December 23, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and all claims for relief brought are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 12/23/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(smj)
December 23, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 12/23/13. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(smj)
November 10, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Mark A. J. Fassold for Alexis Christopher Barber. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/10/2011. (cbb)
November 10, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added William Joseph Maiberger, Jr, Jon Todd Powell, Brant S. Mittler for Alexis Christopher Barber. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/10/2011. (cbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. DeRoyal Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Christopher Barber
Represented By: Mark A. J. Fassold
Represented By: Brian Leighton Kinsley
Represented By: William Joseph Maiberger, Jr.
Represented By: Brant S. Mittler
Represented By: Jon Todd Powell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeRoyal Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]