Alex Lee, Inc. v. Performance Food Group, Inc.

Counter_claimant: Performance Food Group, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Alex Lee, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alex Lee, Inc.
Defendant: Performance Food Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv00188
Filed: November 30, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Thomas A. Clare for Performance Food Group, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/13/2013. (cbb)
April 1, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 16 Motion to Compel Arbitration of Counterclaims; denying as moot 16 Alternative Motion to Strike ; granting 16 Second Alternative Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration. This matte r is stayed pending the outcome of the arbitration. Within 30 days of the issuance of any arbitration award or other resolution of that proceeding, the parties' counsel, jointly or severally, shall report the results to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/1/13. (smj)
July 10, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 21 Respondent's Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Decision is overruled. The Magistrate Judge's 20 Memorandum and Order is hereby affirmed. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 7/9/13. (smj)
July 25, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 27 Defendant's Motion For Appointment of Arbitrator; granting 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Arbitrator. Kevin Walker is the substitute arbitrator. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/25/14. (smj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alex Lee, Inc. v. Performance Food Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Performance Food Group, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A Clare, PC
Represented By: Jennifer K. Van Zant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Alex Lee, Inc.
Represented By: G. Michael Barnhill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Lee, Inc.
Represented By: G. Michael Barnhill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Food Group, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A Clare, PC
Represented By: Jennifer K. Van Zant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]