Berry College, Inc. v. Fary et al

Defendant: Roy Landon Pharr, Dorothy Miller Pharr and Bree Blaine Fary
Plaintiff: Berry College, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00031
Filed: February 19, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Intervene. The Pharr fiduciaries shall file their pleading in intervention within five (5) days of this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/17/2013. (cbb)
July 30, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Joinder of Necessary Parties. Dfts shall file their pleading within 5 days of this Memorandum and Order and commence service of process on the joined parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/30/2013. (cbb)
September 12, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Christopher C. Marquardt for Berry College, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/12/13. (smj)
December 19, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY and PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/19/13. (smj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Berry College, Inc. v. Fary et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Landon Pharr
Represented By: Andrew L. Fitzgerald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Miller Pharr
Represented By: Andrew L. Fitzgerald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bree Blaine Fary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berry College, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]