Parham v. USA

Respondent: USA
Petitioner: Marcus Dwayne Parham
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00035
Filed: February 22, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Iredell
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2013 10 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 7/10/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
February 7, 2014 14 Featured Case ORDER denying 11 Motion for Reconsideration. Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 2/7/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
March 17, 2014 16 Featured Case ORDER denying 13 Motion For Reconsideration; denying 15 Motion for Reconsideration. Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 3/17/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(smj)
July 10, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER dismissing as successive Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 7/10/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Parham v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus Dwayne Parham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]