Albarran-Martinez v. USA

Respondent: USA
Petitioner: Herculano Albarran-Martinez
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00052
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Iredell
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying and dismissing Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 7/9/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
July 10, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 7/9/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
July 29, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 5 Motion for the Goverment to Respond. Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 7/29/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Albarran-Martinez v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Herculano Albarran-Martinez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]