Billings v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Roy E. Billings
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 5:2013cv00057
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Ashe
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Remand to Social Security Administration.The clerk will enter a separate judgment.. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 12/19/13. (smj)
December 19, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 12/19/13. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (smj)
January 6, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 17 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/6/2014. (cbb)
January 8, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. SSA shall pay $3,837.37 in attorney fees to Plaintiff, Roy E. Billings in full settlement and satisfaction of any and all claims for attorney fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/7/14. (smj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billings v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy E. Billings
Represented By: Samuel F. Furgiuele, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]