Brown v. Cooper

Petitioner: Marcus Randall Brown
Respondent: Roy Cooper
Case Number: 5:2013cv00074
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:1651 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing as moot 12 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 1/15/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
July 9, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 1 Petition for Writ of Error Coram Nobis. It is further ordered that petr's Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 7/9/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
July 10, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 7/9/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus Randall Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Roy Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]