Nokota Horse Conservancy, Inc. v. Bernhardt

Plaintiff: Nokota Horse Conservancy, Inc.
Defendant: David J Bernhardt
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00024
Filed: May 1, 2009
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Emmons
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2010 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 16, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 27 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's response is due by October 6, 2009. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 20, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting 41 Motion for TRO (RAB) Distributed on 10/20/2009 (ks).
June 25, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2009 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller. Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 10, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Show Cause Hearing scheduled for 12/3/2009 is rescheduled for 2/19/2010 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. A Status Conference is set for 12/1/2009 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Defendants objection to Venue of Deposition is moot. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 13, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (amended): The Show Cause Hearing scheduled for 12/3/2009 is rescheduled for 2/19/2010 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. A Status Conference is set for 12/1/2009 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Defendants objection to Venue of Deposition is moot. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
December 28, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 1/19/2010 at 10:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 17, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Show Cause Hearing set for 2/19/2010 shall be rescheduled for 5/7/2010 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 2/17/2010. (rs)
June 26, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice (James A. Orr); granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice (Jason M. Prine); and granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice (David E. Weslow). (BG) Distributed on 6/26/2009 to Attorneys James A. Orr, Jason M. Prine, and David E. Weslow. (rs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nokota Horse Conservancy, Inc. v. Bernhardt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nokota Horse Conservancy, Inc.
Represented By: Donald R. Becker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J Bernhardt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]