Cochell v. Pokorny Chiropractic Clinic et al

Plaintiff: Melissa Cochell
Defendant: Pokorny Chiropractic Clinic, David Pokorny DC, Richard Pokorny DC, Sheldon Gordon DC and Jeffrey D Pokorny DC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00031
Filed: June 15, 2009
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Stark
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice (James M Ragain); granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice (John R Christensen). (BG) Distributed on 7/13/2009 (ks).
August 4, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2009 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 14, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland re 15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Melissa Cochell. (LR)
September 10, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2010 at 11:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 10, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (amended - date corrected at signature line): Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2010 at 11:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Modified on 9/11/2009 to explain why order was amended. (ks).
September 10, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re supplement briefing on Defendant Pokorny Chiropractic Clinic's pending 10 MOTION to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 11, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (amended) re supplement briefing on Defendant Pokorny Chiropractic Clinic's pending 10 MOTION to Dismiss. (Amending the date on which responses to Defendant's supplement brief are due) By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 25, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 32 Stipulation To Extend Deadlines. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cochell v. Pokorny Chiropractic Clinic et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Cochell
Represented By: James M Ragain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pokorny Chiropractic Clinic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pokorny DC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pokorny DC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheldon Gordon DC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey D Pokorny DC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]