Cook Waterfowl Foundation Inc v. Attorney General for the State of North Dakota

Plaintiff: Cook Waterfowl Foundation Inc
Defendant: Attorney General for the State of North Dakota
Case Number: 1:2011cv00040
Filed: April 27, 2011
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2011 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 23, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE and cancelling the scheduling conference set 9/30/2011. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order)(BG)
May 18, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties are directed to file a status report with court by 6/1/2012. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 20, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2014 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
August 12, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/15/2014 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 15, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The final pretial conference set for 8/21/2014 and trial set for 9/03/2014 are cancelled with the understanding that they may be rescheduled as necessary at a future date. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook Waterfowl Foundation Inc v. Attorney General for the State of North Dakota
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cook Waterfowl Foundation Inc
Represented By: C. Nicholas Vogel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General for the State of North Dakota
Represented By: Charles M. Carvell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]