Arena Holdings Charitable, LLC et al v. Harman Professional, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Arena Holdings Charitable, LLC and RE Arena, Inc.
Defendant: Harman Professional, Inc. and Harman International Industries, Incorporated
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00031
Filed: March 23, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Grand Forks
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 25, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2013 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 26, 2012 19 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (BG)
October 31, 2012 36 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 4/8/2014 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
July 17, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 2/20/2014 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (2 days). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
November 4, 2013 59 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 58 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher P. Malone. (BG)
February 18, 2014 80 Featured Case ORDER re Settlement Conference. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Arena Holdings Charitable, LLC et al v. Harman Professional, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arena Holdings Charitable, LLC
Represented By: Richard R. Rardin
Represented By: Patrick Robert Morley
Represented By: Brad W. Breslau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RE Arena, Inc.
Represented By: Brad W. Breslau
Represented By: Patrick Robert Morley
Represented By: Richard R. Rardin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harman Professional, Inc.
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harman International Industries, Incorporated
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]