Skalicky v. Braun et al

Defendant: Lean Bersearch, Kolby Braun and Troy Schutz
Plaintiff: Thomas Alan Skalicky
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00061
Filed: May 22, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 10 Motion for Discovery without prejudice. (BG) Distributed on 6/8/2012. (rm)
June 8, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion be Allowed to Submit Exhibits with Attached Arguments. Plaintiff has until 7/09/2012 to file an amended complaint with the court. (BG) Distributed on 6/8/2012. (rm)
June 8, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 8 Motion for Order of Seizure of Person or Property. (BG) Distributed on 6/8/2012. (rm)
June 11, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER (AMENDED) granting 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Amended to Correct Scrivener's error in caption). (BG)
June 11, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER (AMENDED) denying 10 MOTION for Discovery without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Amended to correct scrivener's error in caption). (BG)
June 11, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER (AMENDED) granting in part and denying in part 9 MOTION to be Allowed to Submit Exhibits with Attached Arguments. Plaintiff has until 7/09/2012 to file an amended complaint with the court. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
June 12, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER (amended) denying 8 MOTION for Order of Seizure of Person or Property. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 26, 2012 25 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. finding as moot 23 Motion to Dismiss and further directing service on defendants. (BG) Distributed on 7/26/2012 (jt).
July 27, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER (amended) finding as moot defendants' 23 MOTION to Dismiss and further directing service on defendants. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (amended to correct caption) (BG) Distributed on 7/27/2012 (jt).
September 13, 2012 30 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 29 Motion for Discovery without prejudice. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Skalicky v. Braun et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lean Bersearch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kolby Braun
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Schutz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Alan Skalicky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]