Ragland et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota

Plaintiff: James Ragland, Regional Neurological Center, P.C. and Dakota MRI, Inc.
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00080
Filed: June 19, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian Thomson; granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Robert Crosby. (BG) NEF regenerated to attorneys Thomson and Crosby on 7/5/2012. (rm)
November 14, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting in part and denying in part Blue Cross's 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (QF)
December 5, 2012 26 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2013 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. The court will initiate the conference call. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
January 3, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 2/4/2013 at 11:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 3, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 4, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER SUSPENDING SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 7/19/2013 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
June 25, 2013 68 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
February 10, 2014 75 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. canceling final pretrial conference set for 2/25/2014 and trial set for 3/10/2014. (BG)
August 21, 2014 78 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2015 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ragland et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ragland
Represented By: Irvin B. Nodland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regional Neurological Center, P.C.
Represented By: Irvin B. Nodland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota MRI, Inc.
Represented By: Irvin B. Nodland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota
Represented By: Joel E. Abrahamson
Represented By: David Robert Crosby
Represented By: Brian W. Thomson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]