Pitman v. Vogel Law Firm et al

Plaintiff: David Pitman
Defendant: Vogel Law Firm and John Brakke
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00103
Filed: July 30, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 18, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 29 Stipulation. Pretrial deadlines shall be amended as follows. Discovery due by 8/15/2013. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/1/2013. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/1/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2013. The court shall conduct a Mid-Discovery Status Conference on 6/17/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 13, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 6/20/2013 at 10:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
October 9, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pitman v. Vogel Law Firm et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pitman
Represented By: David E. Boeck
Represented By: Christine A. Hogan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vogel Law Firm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brakke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]