Little v. Rummel et al

Plaintiff: Parke W. Little
Defendant: Charles A. Rummel, Stewart Stenberg, Matthew Kolling, Clarence A. Tuhy, Stark, County of and Dickinson, City of
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00113
Filed: August 23, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Stark
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
November 1, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Timothy C. Lamb. (BG)
December 17, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 25, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 26 Motion to Compel without prejudice. (BG)
February 5, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Cancelling Trial and Final Pretrial Conference. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
June 6, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 35 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the alternative Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 64 Motion for Summary Judgment. (KT)
September 12, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part 78 Motion for Costs; granting in part 80 Motion for Costs. (KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Little v. Rummel et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parke W. Little
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles A. Rummel
Represented By: Scott K. Porsborg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Stenberg
Represented By: Scott K. Porsborg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Kolling
Represented By: Scott K. Porsborg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence A. Tuhy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stark, County of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dickinson, City of
Represented By: Scott K. Porsborg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]