Carpenter v. Last Chance Saloon, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ron Carpenter
Defendant: Last Chance Saloon, Inc. and Joshua Luger
Case Number: 1:2012cv00127
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Sioux
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2014 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. The court will initiate the conference call. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
September 24, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Motion Hearing as to 21 MOTION to Compel and 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling/Discovery Plan. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2013 at 03:00 PM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
November 15, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 20 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 21 Motion to Compel; and Requiring Attorney Delmore to Appear and Show Cause. (KT)
November 26, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
September 22, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 34 Motion to Amend Scheduling/Discovery Plan and to Reschedule Final Pretrial Conference and Trial. Deadline for completing discovery and for filing dispositive motions extended un til 7/03/2014. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 10/3/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Jury Trial reset for 10/15/2014 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (3 days). (Final Pretrial and Trial were scheduled for 6/24/2014 and 7/08/2014 respectively). (Order Amended to correct date of Jury Trial in text of Order). (KT)
October 31, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 51 Stipulation of Dismissal. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 27, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter v. Last Chance Saloon, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Carpenter
Represented By: Mark V. Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Last Chance Saloon, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Luger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]