Burt v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation

Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Plaintiff: Mavis I Burt
Special_master: John D. Feerick
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00128
Filed: September 24, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2012 150 Featured Case ORDER: Case Management/Status Conference set for 12/18/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 12, 2012 154 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 151 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick R. Harkins. (BG)
December 18, 2012 156 Featured Case ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/19/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 18, 2012 157 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 20, 2012 159 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER I: The parties can commence damage discovery immediately. Plaintiff's updated list of liability experts by due by 3/1/2013. Parties shall provide this court with a list of the outstanding motions and related briefs file d in the MDL proceedings by 3/1/2013. Plaintiff's list of damage witnesses due by 5/1/2013. Parties shall provide this court with copies of transcripts of expert depositions and court testimony filed in the MDL proceedings by 3/1/2013. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
December 27, 2012 161 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 160 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel A. Osborn. (KT)
January 14, 2013 163 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 162 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katharine R. Latimer. (KT)
June 27, 2013 171 Featured Case Case Management Order II: Parties have until 11/1/2013 to complete fact discovery on the issue of damages. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 19, 2013 172 Featured Case Case Management Order III: The pending summary judgment and Daubert motions filed in the Middle District of Tennessee are deemed moot. Defendant shall re-file these motions in this district by 8/23/2013. Plaintiffs shall re-file their responses to these motions by 9/13/2013.(BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Burt v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mavis I Burt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: John D. Feerick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]