Fernandez v. State of North Dakota

Defendant: State of North Dakota, Senior Correctional Officer Ross, Deputy Warden Foster, Unit Manager Conway, Warden Schmalenberger, Correctional Caseworker Schwere, North Dakota Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Leann K Bertsch and Deputy Warden Branson
Plaintiff: Kevin Fernandez
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00161
Filed: November 26, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2013 103 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 76 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 76 Motion for Reconsideration ; finding as moot 86 Motion to File Supplemental Points to the Motion to Amend. (BG)
December 9, 2013 106 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. finding as moot 84 Motion for Hearing; granting in part 91 Motion to Clarify Scheduling Order and 92 Motion to Exceed the Number of Interrogatories Plaintiff May Serve On Defendants; granting 93 Motion for Leave to Depart from the Obligation of D.N.D. Civ. L.R. Rule 37.1(B). Each side shall be permitted to serve a total of 50 interrogatories. (BG) Distributed on 12/9/2013. (rh)
December 18, 2013 108 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying without prejudice plaintiff's 96 Motion for Court to Issue an Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum. (BG)
January 7, 2014 116 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 115 Motion for Reconsideration. (BG) Distributed on 1/7/2014. (rh)
January 30, 2014 129 Featured Case ORDER granting 109 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Complete Discovery and/or Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/21/2014. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 24, 2014 151 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. finding as moot 138 Motion for Reconsideration ; finding as moot 138 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 140 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; finding as moot 144 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (BG) Distributed on 3/24/2014 (jt).
April 4, 2014 158 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 113 Motion to Compel. (BG) Distributed on 4/4/2014. (rh)
April 4, 2014 162 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 159 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; granting 160 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; denying 160 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's reply in support of his Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and sur-reply to defendants' reply in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment are due by 4/28/2014. Defendant's response to sur-reply is due by 5/9/2014. (BG) Distributed on 4/4/2014 (jt).
February 5, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER: Parties' proposed scheduling/discovery plans due by 3/15/2013. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Sample Scheduling Discovery Plan) (KT) Distributed on 2/5/2013. (rs)
March 5, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 36 Motion Increase Copy Fee Limit without prejudice. (BG) Distributed on 3/5/2013 (jt).
March 29, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2014 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed to Kevin Fernandez. (rs)
April 29, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 43 Motion for Court to Issue and Serve Subpoena Duces Tecums. (BG) Distributed on 4/29/2013 (rs).
June 3, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 54 Motion for Court to Order the Clerk of the Court to Mailthe Plaintiff Proof of Filing Copies. The Clerks office shall provide plaintiff with a copy of the docket sheet for this case(BG) Distributed on 6/3/2013 (jt).
June 14, 2013 65 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 56 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; denying 57 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 64 Motion for Reconsideration. (BG)
June 24, 2013 70 Featured Case ORDER (Amended) granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 17, 2013 72 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. finding as moot 52 Motion to Compel; denying 53 Motion for Copies at Government Expense. (BG) Distributed on 7/17/2013 (jt).
December 7, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 4 Motion to Issue and Serve Summons and Complaint. (BG) Distributed on 12/7/2012 (rs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fernandez v. State of North Dakota
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Douglas Alan Bahr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Correctional Officer Ross
Represented By: Douglas Alan Bahr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Foster
Represented By: Douglas Alan Bahr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Manager Conway
Represented By: Douglas Alan Bahr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Schmalenberger
Represented By: Douglas Alan Bahr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Caseworker Schwere
Represented By: Douglas Alan Bahr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Douglas Alan Bahr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leann K Bertsch
Represented By: Douglas Alan Bahr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Branson
Represented By: Douglas Alan Bahr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Fernandez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]