GMX Resources Inc. v. Poseidon Concepts, Inc.

Plaintiff: GMX Resources Inc.
Defendant: Poseidon Concepts, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00003
Filed: January 7, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ethan G. Ostroff. (BG) NEF regenerated to Ostroff on 3/7/2013. (rm)
March 18, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 26, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE: All pretrial deadlines are suspended. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2014 and trial set for 10/21/2014 are cancelled. The parties are to notify the court when the automatic stay in plaintiff's bankruptcy has terminated or expired. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 14, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: GMX Resources Inc. v. Poseidon Concepts, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GMX Resources Inc.
Represented By: Amy M. Oster
Represented By: John W. Morrison, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poseidon Concepts, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]