Multi-Chem Group, LLC v. 3Chem, LLC et al

Defendant: Pam Klabo, Shane Sowatzki, 3Chem, LLC and Tim Gable
Plaintiff: Multi-Chem Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00006
Filed: January 10, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/13/2013 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
April 16, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
May 7, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John F. Booth. (KT)
May 14, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2014 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
May 14, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/15/2013 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
August 7, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Multi-Chem Group, LLC v. 3Chem, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Klabo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Sowatzki
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3Chem, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Gable
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Multi-Chem Group, LLC
Represented By: M. Daniel Vogel
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]