Willoughby v. Hagan

Plaintiff: Arthur Ray Willoughby
Defendant: John Hagan
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00054
Filed: April 30, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Each party shall submit a proposed pretrial plan by 8/12/2013. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sample Plan) (BG) Distributed on 7/2/2013 (jt).
September 9, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 9/9/2013.(rh)
September 5, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting 24 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 29 Report and Recommendations. by Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(MM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Willoughby v. Hagan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Ray Willoughby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hagan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]