Kanneh v. Burleigh County Detention Center

Plaintiff: Alahaji Mohamed Kanneh
Defendant: Burleigh County Detention Center
Case Number: 1:2013cv00067
Filed: June 12, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re § 1915A Screening for Service of Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
February 4, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Pretrial Scheduling/Discovery Plan. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Sample Scheduling/Discovery Plan)(KT) Distributed on 2/4/2014. (rh)
April 9, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. re 32 Motion for Discovery. (KT) Distributed on 4/9/2014 (jt).
November 17, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; adopting 38 Report and Recommendations; dismissing the action without prejudice and denying as moot 25 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (MM) Distributed on 11/17/2014. (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kanneh v. Burleigh County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alahaji Mohamed Kanneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burleigh County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.