Schmidt v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al

Plaintiff: Christopher B Schmidt
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC, Palisades Collection LLC and RJM Acquisitions LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv00044
Filed: July 31, 2009
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2009 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 2, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2010 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 14, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 Notice of Withdrawal. Attorney Thomas Lyons Jr. is granted leave to withdraw as Plaintiff's counsel. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 19, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court (FILED IN WRONG CASE) ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2011 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Modified to restrict access on 8/19/2010 (jd).
August 19, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 39 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Dispositive Motions. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set 11/30/2010 is rescheduled for 2/1/2011 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller , Jr. The court shall initiate the conference call. The Jury Trial set 12/13/2010 is rescheduled for 2/15/2011 at 9:30 AM in Minot Courtroom before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. A 3 day trial is anticipated. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 8/19/2010. (rs)
September 9, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 6 Stipulation filed by Palisades Collection LLC, 4 and Stipulation filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Palisades' and Experian's responses to Plaintiff's complaint due by 9/22/2009. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Schmidt v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher B Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palisades Collection LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJM Acquisitions LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]