Peterson et al v. Sagebrush Resources LLC

Plaintiff: Daryl G Peterson and Christine Peterson
Defendant: Sagebrush Resources LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2010cv00061
Filed: August 3, 2010
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Bottineau
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 4 Motion to Remand (CP)
September 14, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/20/2010 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 23, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 12/6/2010 at 9:30 AM in Minot Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 9/23/2010. (rs)
September 23, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2011 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 17, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting 33 Report and Recommendation; granting in part 25 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (CP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Peterson et al v. Sagebrush Resources LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl G Peterson
Represented By: Mark V. Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Peterson
Represented By: Mark V. Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagebrush Resources LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]