McDonald v. Trinity Health et al

Plaintiff: Lenishka A McDonald
Defendant: Trinity Health and Frederick K Ness
Case Number: 4:2010cv00087
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/14/2011 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 14, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2012 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 11, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re motion for change of venue. Motions for change of venue due by 2/1/2012. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 19, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery and expert depositions due by 4/15/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2012. ADR effort to be completed by 6/15/2012. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Modified on 1/19/2012 to correct date of completion of ADR effort. Regenerated NEF. (rs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Trinity Health et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenishka A McDonald
Represented By: Lee R. Bissonette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Health
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick K Ness
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]