Feickert v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: William Feickert
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv00062
Filed: August 9, 2011
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:626
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 19 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling/Discovery Plan. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/16/2012. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/24/2012. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 2, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 21 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling/Discovery Plan. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 25, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 1/11/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2013 is rescheduled for 5/7/2013 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Jury Trial set 4/08/2013 is rescheduled for 5/20/2013 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (4 days). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 7, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 6/10/2013 at 09:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 28, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrea Hyatt; granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tamara Buettner Middleton. (BG)
September 29, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2011 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feickert v. BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Feickert
Represented By: Mark V. Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]