Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc. v. Longie et al

Plaintiff: Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Defendant: Howard Longie, Larry Gorospe and United States of America
Counter_claimant: Larry Gorospe and Howard Longie
Counter_defendant: Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv00076
Filed: September 27, 2011
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Time to Respond to 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Summary Judgment Regarding Discrimination, Equal Protection, § 1981, § 1983 and Fraud Claims filed by Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc. Response due by 1/10/2013. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
January 23, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the parties' 110 Joint Stipulation Staying all Deadlines. All pending pretrial deadlines are stayed and pending motions are held in abeyance until further order of the court. The following are canceled: the bench trial set for 2/20/2013 and the jury trial set for 6/25/2013. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 28, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 5, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 3/1/2012 at 9:30 AM in Minot Courtroom (2 days) before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 20, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2013 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 29, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying 35 Motion to Stay. (BG)
March 27, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Consolidation of Cases by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
July 17, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/2/2012 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 3, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for dispositive motion deadlines, bench trial, and expert disclosure deadlines re the issue of "use and necessity." Bench Trial set for 11/13/2012 is rescheduled for 2/20/2013 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L . Hovland (3 days). Status Conference set for 9/11/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Final pretrial conference set for 1/29/2013 and jury trial set for 2/21/2013 are canceled. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 13, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 11/7/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Pending the status conference, the following shall be held in abeyance: CPEC's 55 MOTION to Dismiss Claims, Other than Condemnation Objections and Defenses. Expert disclosures re the issue of use and necessity are due by 11/01/2012. CPEC has until 11/1/2012 to disclose all appraisal testimony. Responsive opinion testimony due by 12/1/2012. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 5, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 78 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Responses to CPEC's 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Use and Necessity are due by 10/26/2012. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 26, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 84 Stipulation for Extension of Time to respond to CPEC'S Summary Judgment Motion on the Issue of Use and Necessity. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 21, 2012 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 12/4/2012 at 9:00 AM in Minot Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc. v. Longie et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Debra L. Hoffarth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Longie
Represented By: Larry M. Baer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Gorospe
Represented By: Larry M. Baer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Larry Gorospe
Represented By: Larry M. Baer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Howard Longie
Represented By: Larry M. Baer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Debra L. Hoffarth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]