Dish Network Service LLC v. Laducer et al

Defendant: Brian Laducer and Madonna Marcellais
Plaintiff: Dish Network Service LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00058
Filed: May 18, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Rolette
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 16 Motion for Hearing. (CP)
July 10, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Early Settlement Conference set for 8/14/2012 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 11, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Pantelis Michalopoulos; granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John J. Duffy. (BG) NEF regenerated to Michalopoulos and Duffy on 6/11/2012. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dish Network Service LLC v. Laducer et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Laducer
Represented By: Thomas A. Dickson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madonna Marcellais
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dish Network Service LLC
Represented By: Pantelis Michalopoulos
Represented By: John J. Duffy
Represented By: Christopher J. Nyhus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]