Slawson Exploration Company, Inc. v. Danks

Plaintiff: Slawson Exploration Company, Inc.
Defendant: Edward S. Danks
Case Number: 4:2012cv00104
Filed: July 31, 2012
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 10, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (amended): Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (amended to correct date) (BG)
August 2, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting Slawson Exploration's 2 Motion for TRO. (QF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slawson Exploration Company, Inc. v. Danks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slawson Exploration Company, Inc.
Represented By: Amy L. De Kok
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward S. Danks
Represented By: Reed Alan Soderstrom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]