Meyer v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Ronald Meyer
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00132
Filed: October 2, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 25, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER adopting 13 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling/Discovery Plan. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/1/2013. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 12/16/2013. Expert Discovery Depositions due by 1/31/2014. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
October 12, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Megan K. Ricke. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
October 17, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Meyer v. BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Meyer
Represented By: Michael F. Tello
Represented By: Michael P. McReynolds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Megan K. Ricke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]