Trenton Indian Service Area v. Loudermilk et al

Defendant: Weldon B. Loudermilk and Yvonne Larocque
Plaintiff: Trenton Indian Service Area
Case Number: 4:2012cv00143
Filed: October 18, 2012
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 25:640 Indian Tribal Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2014 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
October 15, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cindy L. Turcotte. (KT) NEF regenerated to Turcotte on 10/15/2013. (rm)
October 23, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying the Trenton Indian Service Area's 2 Motion for TRO. (QF)
April 3, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trenton Indian Service Area v. Loudermilk et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weldon B. Loudermilk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Larocque
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trenton Indian Service Area
Represented By: Karla J. Hauk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]