Bakken Residential, LLC v. Cahoon Enterprises, LLC

Plaintiff: Bakken Residential, LLC
Defendant: Cahoon Enterprises, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00146
Filed: October 19, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 26, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER re Pending Motions: The parties shall file any responses or supplemental materials regarding 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 18 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, 22 MOTION for Prelimin ary Injunction, and 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Plaintiff's Cross-Motion) by 5/1/2013. The parties shall advise the court whether they request a hearing on the motions by 5/1/2013. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
April 29, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER Extending Deadlines: The parties shall file any responses or supplemental materials regarding 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 18 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, 22 MOTION for Prelimin ary Injunction, and 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Plaintiff's Cross-Motion) by 5/15/2013. The parties shall advise the court whether they request a hearing on the pending motions by 5/15/2013. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
May 14, 2013 30 Featured Case SECOND ORDER Extending Deadlines: The parties shall file any responses regarding 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 18 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, and 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Plaintiff's Cross-Motion) by 5/31/2013. The parties shall advise the court whether they request a hearing on the pending motions by 5/31/2013. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
May 31, 2013 31 Featured Case THIRD ORDER extending Deadlines: The parties shall file any responses regarding 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 18 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Plaintiff's Cross-Motion by 6/30/2013. The parties shall advise teh court whether they request a hearing on the pending motions by 6/30/2013. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 8, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER: The court shall hold its ruling on all pendng motions in abeyance until advised by the parties that they are ready for the court to proceed. A Status Conference is set for 1/24/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 28, 2014 42 Featured Case ORDER Holding Pending Motions in Abeyance and Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 3/28/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The court will initiate the conference call. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
March 28, 2014 44 Featured Case ORDER Holding Pending Motions in Abeyance and Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 6/16/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
June 16, 2014 47 Featured Case ORDER Holding Pending Motions in Abeyance and Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 8/12/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
December 6, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2013 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. The court will initiate the conference call. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bakken Residential, LLC v. Cahoon Enterprises, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bakken Residential, LLC
Represented By: Zachary E. Pelham
Represented By: B. Timothy Durick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cahoon Enterprises, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]