391 Franklin Turnpike Limited Liability Company v. Tank

Plaintiff: 391 Franklin Turnpike Limited Liability Company
Defendant: Greggory G. Tank
Case Number: 4:2012cv00162
Filed: November 28, 2012
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 21, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Exclusion of Trial Witnesses and for Submission of Revised Exhibit Lists. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
December 1, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2015 at 10:30 AM CST by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
May 2, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 391 Franklin Turnpike Limited Liability Company v. Tank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 391 Franklin Turnpike Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greggory G. Tank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]