North Prairie Rural Water District v. Surrey, City of et al

Plaintiff: North Prairie Rural Water District
Defendant: Surrey, City of and Silver Springs Development Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv00165
Filed: December 6, 2012
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/23/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 23, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff shall have until 6/07/2013 to file an Amended Complaint. Defendants shall have until 6/21/2013 to file an answer or otherwise respond. The court will defer consideration of plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction unless and until plaintiff renews its request for hearing. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 17, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 22 Stipulation of Dismissal. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Prairie Rural Water District v. Surrey, City of et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Prairie Rural Water District
Represented By: Robert G. Hoy
Represented By: Sean M. Fredricks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surrey, City of
Represented By: Bryan L. Van Grinsven
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Springs Development Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]