King Oil Field Services, LLP v. Poseidon Concepts, Inc.

Defendant: Poseidon Concepts, Inc.
Plaintiff: King Oil Field Services, LLP
Case Number: 4:2013cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Mountrail
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 7, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ethan G. Ostroff. (BG) NEF regenerated to Ostroff on 3/7/2013. (rm)
March 8, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King Oil Field Services, LLP v. Poseidon Concepts, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poseidon Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan L. Van Grinsven
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Oil Field Services, LLP
Represented By: Dean A. Frantsvog
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]