Energy Heating, LLC et al v. Heat On-The-Fly, LLC et al

Defendant: Super Heaters North Dakota, LLC and Heat On-The-Fly, LLC
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Oilfield Services, LLC and Energy Heating, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00010
Filed: January 14, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Stark
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 59 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; finding as moot 90 Motion for Hearing (ET)
February 22, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Len R. Brignac; granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Henry A. King. (BG) Distributed to PHV attorneys on 2/22/2013. (rm)
February 28, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney J. Thomas Vitt; granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mariah Reynolds. (BG)
March 4, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2013 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
May 9, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 25 Stipulation re First Amended Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 25, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Devan V. Padmanabhan and granting 46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michelle E. Dawson. (KT)
July 10, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 50 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul J. Robbennolt. (KT) NEF regenerated to Robbennolt on 7/10/2013. (rm)
July 16, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 53 Stipulation for Protective Order. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
September 10, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/8/2013 at 12:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. All pretrial deadlines, except briefing deadlines pertaining to plaintiff's pending motions, are suspended. The Markman hearing tentatively schedule for 1/14/2014 is cancelled. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 25, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 82 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shane P. Coleman (BG) NEF regenerated to attorney Coleman on 9/25/2013. (rm)
January 23, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney F. Ross Boundy; granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney F. Steven V. Gibbons; granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bobby B. Soltani. (KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Energy Heating, LLC et al v. Heat On-The-Fly, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Heaters North Dakota, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heat On-The-Fly, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Oilfield Services, LLC
Represented By: F. Ross Boundy
Represented By: Steven V. Gibbons
Represented By: William P. Harrie
Represented By: Bobby B. Soltani
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Heating, LLC
Represented By: Steven V. Gibbons
Represented By: F. Ross Boundy
Represented By: William P. Harrie
Represented By: Bobby B. Soltani
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]